House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 149
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 301: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senators Niezgodski and Yoder added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Goode
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Morrison) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Morrison
|
|
|