House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 150
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 337: yeas 40, nays 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 356: yeas 95, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Yoder and Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Hunley
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Davis, Cash, DeLaney, Klinker and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #8 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #7 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #5 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Representative Davis M added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 72: yeas 28, nays 63
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Amendment #3 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Amendment #8 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Representative McGuire J added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Behning
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Goodrich
|
|
|