Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1262 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*HB1262.1*
2-January 25, 2024
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1262
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF HB 1262 (Updated January 24, 2024 2:56 pm - DI 140)
6-Citations Affected: IC 20-33.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 20-33-8.
77 Synopsis: Behavioral issues in schools. Permits a governing body of
88 a school corporation to establish a disruption policy concerning
99 student removal from and reentry to a classroom. Provides that a
1010 principal, teacher, or school staff member may immediately remove a
1111 disruptive student for a violation of school policy. Provides that a
1212 principal must determine a disruptive student's placement. Provides
1313 that a disruptive student who is removed from a classroom at least three
1414 times during a 30 day period shall be considered chronically disruptive
1515 and may be suspended. Requires that a disruption policy must be
1616 included in certain written regulations.
1717 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1818 Smith V
1919 January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education.
20-January 25, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
21-HB 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 January 25, 2024
20+2024 IN 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 Introduced
2221 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2322 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2423 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2524 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2625 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2726 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2827 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2928 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3029 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3130 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3231 HOUSE BILL No. 1262
3332 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3433 education.
3534 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3635 1 SECTION 1. IC 20-33-8-14, AS ADDED BY P.L.1-2005,
3736 2 SECTION 17, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3837 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 14. (a) The following are the grounds for student
3938 4 suspension or expulsion, subject to the procedural requirements of this
4039 5 chapter and as stated by school corporation rules:
4140 6 (1) Student misconduct.
4241 7 (2) Substantial disobedience.
4342 8 (3) Disruption under section 36 of this chapter.
4443 9 (b) The grounds for suspension or expulsion listed in subsection (a)
4544 10 apply when a student is:
4645 11 (1) on school grounds immediately before or during school hours,
4746 12 or immediately after school hours, or at any other time when the
4847 13 school is being used by a school group;
4948 14 (2) off school grounds at a school activity, function, or event; or
5049 15 (3) traveling to or from school or a school activity, function, or
5150 16 event.
5251 17 SECTION 2. IC 20-33-8-18, AS AMENDED BY P.L.155-2020,
53-HB 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 2
52+2024 IN 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 2
5453 1 SECTION 18, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
5554 2 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 18. (a) A principal may suspend a student for not
5655 3 more than ten (10) school days under section 14, 15, or 16, or 36 of
5756 4 this chapter. However, the student may be suspended for more than ten
5857 5 (10) school days under section 23 of this chapter.
5958 6 (b) A principal may not suspend a student before the principal
6059 7 affords the student an opportunity for a meeting during which the
6160 8 student is entitled to the following:
6261 9 (1) A written or an oral statement of the charges against the
6362 10 student.
6463 11 (2) If the student denies the charges, a summary of the evidence
6564 12 against the student.
6665 13 (3) An opportunity for the student to explain the student's
6766 14 conduct.
6867 15 (c) When misconduct requires immediate removal of a student, the
6968 16 meeting under subsection (b) must begin as soon as reasonably possible
7069 17 after the student's suspension.
7170 18 (d) Following a suspension, the principal shall send a written
7271 19 statement to the parent of the suspended student describing the
7372 20 following:
7473 21 (1) The student's misconduct.
7574 22 (2) The action taken by the principal.
7675 23 (e) If a student is suspended, the student is required to complete all
7776 24 assignments and school work assigned during the period of the
7877 25 student's suspension. The principal or the principal's designee shall
7978 26 ensure that the student receives:
8079 27 (1) notice of any assignments or school work due;
8180 28 (2) teacher contact information in the event the student has
8281 29 questions regarding the assignments or school work; and
8382 30 (3) credit, in the same manner that a student who is not suspended
8483 31 would receive, for any assignments or school work assigned
8584 32 during the period of the student's suspension that the student
8685 33 completes.
8786 34 A student may be allowed to make up missed tests or quizzes when the
8887 35 student returns to school.
8988 36 SECTION 3. IC 20-33-8-36 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
9089 37 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
9190 38 1, 2024]: Sec. 36. (a) The governing body of a school corporation
9291 39 may establish a disruption policy concerning student removal from
9392 40 and reentry to a classroom if a student:
9493 41 (1) disrupts the educational function of the classroom; or
9594 42 (2) challenges the authority of school corporation personnel
96-HB 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 3
95+2024 IN 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 3
9796 1 who are supervising the classroom.
9897 2 (b) A principal, teacher, or school staff member may
9998 3 immediately remove a disruptive student from a classroom setting
10099 4 for a violation of a policy under subsection (a).
101100 5 (c) A principal shall determine the placement of a disruptive
102101 6 student removed from a classroom under subsection (b). Placement
103102 7 of a student may include:
104103 8 (1) another classroom in the school;
105104 9 (2) an alternative program; or
106105 10 (3) a virtual program.
107106 11 (d) A disruptive student who is removed under subsection (b) at
108107 12 least three (3) times within a thirty (30) day period shall be
109108 13 considered chronically disruptive and may be suspended.
110109 14 (e) A policy adopted under subsection (a) must be included in
111110 15 any written regulations created under section 10 of this chapter.
112-HB 1262—LS 6728/DI 143 4
113-COMMITTEE REPORT
114-Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Education, to which was referred
115-House Bill 1262, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
116-to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said
117-bill do pass.
118-(Reference is to HB 1262 as introduced.)
119-BEHNING
120-Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
121-HB 1262—LS 6728/DI 143
111+2024 IN 1262—LS 6728/DI 143