House
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 87
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 284: yeas 84, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Deery added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 40, nays 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Koch
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 86, nays 8
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representatives Jeter C and Pierce M added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Soliday
|
|
|