Senate | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Garten | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 93, nays 4 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Authored by Representative Schaibley | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Barrett and McGuire |