House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 157
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 323: yeas 42, nays 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 2 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Motion to withdraw CCR #1: prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the House; Roll Call 323: yeas 76, nays 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 2 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senator Pol removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Representative Lindauer added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Representative Johnson B removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Ford J.D., Rogers and Bohacek
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Baldwin and Pol
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Miller D, May, Hall, Bauer M and Errington
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Pressel and Johnson B
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 45, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Bohacek removed as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 82, nays 14
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Baldwin and Bohacek
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative Miller D added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Representative Pressel
|
|
|