Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1333 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/10/2024

                     
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1333
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 5-10-8-27.
Synopsis:  Emerging therapies. Requires, before January 1, 2025, the
state personnel department to explore evidence supporting
opportunities for benefit modification of the state employee health plan
informed by the Choosing Wisely initiative, emerging therapies, and
therapeutic alternatives to invasive surgical procedures. Requires,
before July 1, 2025, the state personnel department to: (1) identify and
consider implementation of pilot programs that include step therapy or
center of excellence approaches for which evidence demonstrates cost
savings to the state employee health plan; and (2) identify opportunities
to stimulate conversations between covered individuals and health care
providers about appropriate and necessary treatment.
Effective:  Upon passage.
Borders
January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance.
2024	IN 1333—LS 6895/DI 141 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1333
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning state
and local administration.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 5-10-8-27 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 UPON PASSAGE]: Sec. 27. (a) As used in this section, "Choosing
4 Wisely initiative" means the initiative established by the American
5 Board of Internal Medicine Foundation that seeks to advance a
6 national dialogue on avoiding wasteful or unnecessary medical
7 tests, treatments, and procedures.
8 (b) As used in this section, "covered individual" means an
9 individual who is covered under a state employee health plan.
10 (c) As used in this section, "emerging therapies" means
11 therapeutic services that have not historically been covered by the
12 state employee health plan but for which new evidence may
13 demonstrate therapeutic enhancements or opportunities for cost
14 avoidance.
15 (d) As used in this section, "evidence" means peer reviewed
16 objective studies of emerging therapies.
17 (e) As used in this section, "regenerative injection therapy"
2024	IN 1333—LS 6895/DI 141 2
1 means a nonsurgical orthopedic treatment performed by injecting
2 into a joint or soft tissue a substance that stimulates the growth of
3 normal cells and tissues for the purpose of strengthening or
4 repairing a painful or injured joint or connective tissue.
5 (f) As used in this section, "state employee health plan" means
6 one (1) of the following:
7 (1) A self-insurance program established under section 7(b) of
8 this chapter.
9 (2) A contract with a prepaid health care delivery plan
10 entered into under section 7(c) of this chapter.
11 (g) Before January 1, 2025, the state personnel department shall
12 explore evidence supporting opportunities for benefit modification
13 of the state employee health plan informed by the following:
14 (1) The Choosing Wisely initiative.
15 (2) Emerging therapies.
16 (3) Therapeutic alternatives to invasive surgical procedures,
17 such as regenerative injection therapy.
18 (h) Before July 1, 2025, the state personnel department shall do
19 the following:
20 (1) Identify and consider implementation of pilot programs
21 that include step therapy or center of excellence approaches
22 for which evidence demonstrates cost savings to the state
23 employee health plan.
24 (2) Identify opportunities to stimulate conversations between
25 covered individuals and health care providers about
26 appropriate and necessary treatment, including treatment
27 recommendations identified by the Choosing Wisely initiative.
28 (i) This section expires July 1, 2026.
29 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
2024	IN 1333—LS 6895/DI 141