Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1353 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1353
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 20-19-3-32.5; IC 20-26-11.
77 Synopsis: Education matters. Requires the department of education to
88 prepare a report to the general assembly compiling certain data over a
99 40 year period. Provides that the parents of any high school student
1010 may request a transfer from a school corporation in which the student
1111 has a legal settlement to a transferee school corporation in Indiana if
1212 the student may be better accommodated by the athletics program
1313 offered by the public schools of the transferee corporation.
1414 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1515 Morris, Behning, Morrison, Judy
1616 January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education.
1717 2024 IN 1353—LS 7015/DI 143 Introduced
1818 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1919 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2020 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2121 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2222 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2323 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2424 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2525 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2626 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2727 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2828 HOUSE BILL No. 1353
2929 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3030 education.
3131 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3232 1 SECTION 1. IC 20-19-3-32.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
3333 2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3434 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 32.5. (a) As used in this section,
3535 4 "cohort" has the meaning set forth in IC 20-26-13-2.
3636 5 (b) As used in this section, "graduation rate" has the meaning
3737 6 set forth in IC 20-26-13-6.
3838 7 (c) Not later than December 31, 2024, the department shall
3939 8 prepare a report compiling data over a forty (40) year period from
4040 9 July 1, 1983, through July 1, 2023, concerning kindergarten
4141 10 through grade 12 students in Indiana. The report must include the
4242 11 following information:
4343 12 (1) What end of school year statewide test, evaluation, or
4444 13 scoring metric was in place each year.
4545 14 (2) What statewide academic standards were in effect each
4646 15 year.
4747 16 (3) For each cohort enrolled in a public school in Indiana the
4848 17 average:
4949 2024 IN 1353—LS 7015/DI 143 2
5050 1 (A) score concerning an end of school year statewide test
5151 2 described in subdivision (1);
5252 3 (B) SAT or ACT score; and
5353 4 (C) graduation rate.
5454 5 (d) Not later than January 1, 2025, the department shall submit
5555 6 the report described in subsection (c) to the general assembly in an
5656 7 electronic format under IC 5-14-6.
5757 8 (e) The department, in conjunction with the state board, shall do
5858 9 the following:
5959 10 (1) Determine, based on the report prepared under subsection
6060 11 (c), which surveyed year produced the highest scores and
6161 12 graduation rates.
6262 13 (2) Not later than the 2025-2026 school year, realign current
6363 14 statewide academic standards to the standards in place during
6464 15 the year determined in subdivision (1).
6565 16 SECTION 2. IC 20-26-11-5.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
6666 17 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
6767 18 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 5.5. (a) As used in this section,
6868 19 "athletics program" refers to:
6969 20 (1) an extracurricular competitive or noncompetitive activity;
7070 21 or
7171 22 (2) marching band.
7272 23 (b) The parents of any high school student, or the student after
7373 24 the student has become eighteen (18) years of age, may request a
7474 25 transfer from a school corporation in which the student has a legal
7575 26 settlement to a transferee school corporation in Indiana if the
7676 27 student may be better accommodated by the athletics program
7777 28 offered by the public schools of the transferee corporation.
7878 29 Whether the student can be better accommodated depends on such
7979 30 matters as:
8080 31 (1) crowded conditions of the transferee or transferor
8181 32 corporation; and
8282 33 (2) athletics program offerings at the high school level that
8383 34 are important to the aspirations of the student.
8484 35 (c) The request for transfer must be made in writing to the
8585 36 transferor corporation, which shall immediately mail a copy to the
8686 37 transferee corporation. The request for transfer must be made at
8787 38 the times provided under rules adopted by the state board. The
8888 39 transfer is effected if both the transferee and the transferor
8989 40 corporations approve the transfer not more than thirty (30) days
9090 41 after that mailing. If the transferor school corporation fails to act
9191 42 on the transfer request within thirty (30) days after the request is
9292 2024 IN 1353—LS 7015/DI 143 3
9393 1 received, the transfer is considered approved. The transfer is
9494 2 denied when either school corporation mails a written denial by
9595 3 certified mail to the requesting parents or student at their last
9696 4 known address.
9797 5 (d) If a request for transfer is denied under subsection (c), an
9898 6 appeal may be taken to the state board by the requesting parents
9999 7 or student, if commenced not more than ten (10) days after the
100100 8 denial. An appeal is commenced by mailing a notice of appeal by
101101 9 certified mail to the superintendent of each school corporation and
102102 10 the state board. The secretary of education shall develop forms for
103103 11 this purpose, and the transferor corporation shall assist the parents
104104 12 or student in the mechanics of commencing the appeal. An appeal
105105 13 hearing must comply with section 15 of this chapter.
106106 14 SECTION 3. IC 20-26-11-6, AS AMENDED BY P.L.30-2010,
107107 15 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
108108 16 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 6. (a) A school corporation may accept a
109109 17 transferring student without approval of the transferor corporation
110110 18 under section 5 or 5.5 of this chapter.
111111 19 (b) A transfer may be accepted regardless of whether, as a condition
112112 20 of the transfer, the transferee school requires the requesting parents or
113113 21 student to pay transfer tuition in an amount determined under the
114114 22 formula established in section 13 of this chapter for the payment of
115115 23 transfer tuition by a transferor school corporation. However, if the
116116 24 transferee school elects to charge transfer tuition, the transferee school
117117 25 may not offset the amounts described in section 13(b) STEP TWO (B)
118118 26 through section 13(b) STEP TWO (D) of this chapter from the amount
119119 27 charged to the requesting parents or student.
120120 28 (c) When the transferee school elects to charge tuition to the
121121 29 requesting parents or student, the tuition determined under subsection
122122 30 (b) must be paid by the parents or the student before the end of the
123123 31 school year in installments as determined by the transferee corporation.
124124 32 (d) Failure to pay a tuition installment that is agreed to by the
125125 33 parents or student and the transferee school corporation is a ground for
126126 34 exclusion from school.
127127 35 (e) If the transferee school elects not to charge transfer tuition to the
128128 36 parents or student under this section, the transferee school may not
129129 37 charge transfer tuition or fees to the transferor school.
130130 2024 IN 1353—LS 7015/DI 143