House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 70
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 246: yeas 89, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senators Glick, Buck, Randolph added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Koch, Dernulc
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Jackson) motion withdrawn voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (McGuire) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Representative McGuire
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Jeter, Steuerwald, Goss-Reaves
|
|
|