House
|
02/12/2024
|
Public Law 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 32, nays 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Goode removed as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 116: yeas 9, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer, Garten, Goode
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 64, nays 30
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Authored by Representative Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Miller D, Wesco, Prescott
|
|
|