Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1411 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1411
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-3-2-1; IC 6-3.6-2-2.
77 Synopsis: Elimination of state individual income tax. Eliminates the
88 state individual adjusted gross income tax by reducing the rate to 0%.
99 Provides that in calculating the local income tax (LIT), which is
1010 imposed based on a local taxpayer's state adjusted gross income, the
1111 calculation of a taxpayer's state adjusted gross income for LIT purposes
1212 shall be calculated under the adjusted gross income tax provisions as
1313 if those provisions, and the most recent adjusted gross income tax rate
1414 before its elimination, were still in effect.
1515 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1616 Payne, Hostettler, Sweet, Cash
1717 January 11, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
1818 2024 IN 1411—LS 6551/DI 125 Introduced
1919 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2020 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2121 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2222 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2323 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2424 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2525 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2626 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2727 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2828 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2929 HOUSE BILL No. 1411
3030 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3131 taxation.
3232 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3333 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-3-2-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.201-2023,
3434 2 SECTION 95, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3535 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1. (a) Each taxable year, a tax at the following rate
3636 4 of adjusted gross income is imposed upon the adjusted gross income of
3737 5 every resident person, and on that part of the adjusted gross income
3838 6 derived from sources within Indiana of every nonresident person:
3939 7 (1) For taxable years beginning before January 1, 2015, three and
4040 8 four-tenths percent (3.4%).
4141 9 (2) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014, and
4242 10 before January 1, 2017, three and three-tenths percent (3.3%).
4343 11 (3) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, and
4444 12 before January 1, 2023, three and twenty-three hundredths percent
4545 13 (3.23%).
4646 14 (4) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022, and
4747 15 before January 1, 2024, three and fifteen hundredths percent
4848 16 (3.15%).
4949 17 (5) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2023, and
5050 2024 IN 1411—LS 6551/DI 125 2
5151 1 before January 1, 2025, three and five-hundredths percent
5252 2 (3.05%).
5353 3 (6) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2024, and
5454 4 before January 1, 2026, three percent (3%). zero percent (0%).
5555 5 (7) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2025, and
5656 6 before January 1, 2027, two and ninety-five hundredths percent
5757 7 (2.95%).
5858 8 (8) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2026, two and
5959 9 nine-tenths percent (2.9%).
6060 10 (b) Except as provided in section 1.5 of this chapter (before its
6161 11 expiration), each taxable year, a tax at the following rate of adjusted
6262 12 gross income is imposed on that part of the adjusted gross income
6363 13 derived from sources within Indiana of every corporation:
6464 14 (1) Before July 1, 2012, eight and five-tenths percent (8.5%).
6565 15 (2) After June 30, 2012, and before July 1, 2013, eight percent
6666 16 (8.0%).
6767 17 (3) After June 30, 2013, and before July 1, 2014, seven and
6868 18 five-tenths percent (7.5%).
6969 19 (4) After June 30, 2014, and before July 1, 2015, seven percent
7070 20 (7.0%).
7171 21 (5) After June 30, 2015, and before July 1, 2016, six and
7272 22 five-tenths percent (6.5%).
7373 23 (6) After June 30, 2016, and before July 1, 2017, six and
7474 24 twenty-five hundredths percent (6.25%).
7575 25 (7) After June 30, 2017, and before July 1, 2018, six percent
7676 26 (6.0%).
7777 27 (8) After June 30, 2018, and before July 1, 2019, five and
7878 28 seventy-five hundredths percent (5.75%).
7979 29 (9) After June 30, 2019, and before July 1, 2020, five and
8080 30 five-tenths percent (5.5%).
8181 31 (10) After June 30, 2020, and before July 1, 2021, five and
8282 32 twenty-five hundredths percent (5.25%).
8383 33 (11) After June 30, 2021, four and nine-tenths percent (4.9%).
8484 34 (c) If for any taxable year a taxpayer is subject to different tax rates
8585 35 under subsection (b), the taxpayer's tax rate for that taxable year is the
8686 36 rate determined in the last STEP of the following STEPS:
8787 37 STEP ONE: Multiply the number of days in the taxpayer's taxable
8888 38 year that precede the day the rate changed by the rate in effect
8989 39 before the rate change.
9090 40 STEP TWO: Multiply the number of days in the taxpayer's
9191 41 taxable year that follow the day before the rate changed by the
9292 42 rate in effect after the rate change.
9393 2024 IN 1411—LS 6551/DI 125 3
9494 1 STEP THREE: Divide the sum of the amounts determined under
9595 2 STEPS ONE and TWO by the number of days in the taxpayer's
9696 3 tax period.
9797 4 However, the rate determined under this subsection shall be rounded
9898 5 to the nearest one-hundredth of one percent (0.01%).
9999 6 SECTION 2. IC 6-3.6-2-2, AS AMENDED BY P.L.239-2017,
100100 7 SECTION 14, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
101101 8 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 2. "Adjusted gross income" has the meaning set
102102 9 forth in IC 6-3-1-3.5 and shall be calculated under IC 6-3 as if the
103103 10 rate under IC 6-3-2-1(a)(5) were still in effect. However:
104104 11 (1) except as provided in subdivision (3), in the case of a local
105105 12 taxpayer who is not treated as a resident local taxpayer of a
106106 13 county, the term includes only adjusted gross income derived
107107 14 from the taxpayer's principal place of business or employment;
108108 15 (2) in the case of a resident local taxpayer of Perry County, the
109109 16 term does not include adjusted gross income described in
110110 17 IC 6-3.6-8-7; and
111111 18 (3) in the case of a local taxpayer described in section 13(3) of
112112 19 this chapter, the term includes only that part of the individual's
113113 20 total income that:
114114 21 (A) is apportioned to Indiana under IC 6-3-2-2.7 or
115115 22 IC 6-3-2-3.2; and
116116 23 (B) is paid to the individual as compensation for services
117117 24 rendered in the county as a team member or race team
118118 25 member.
119119 2024 IN 1411—LS 6551/DI 125