Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1416 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/11/2024

                     
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1416
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 12-7-2-44; IC 12-8-3.5.
Synopsis:  Eating disorder council. Establishes the Indiana eating
disorder council (council). Sets forth the membership and duties of the
council.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Hatfield
January 16, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Family, Children and
Human Affairs.
2024	IN 1416—LS 6996/DI 147 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1416
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 12-7-2-44, AS AMENDED BY P.L.6-2012,
2 SECTION 81, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 44. "Council" means the following:
4 (1) For purposes of IC 12-9-4, the meaning set forth in
5 IC 12-9-4-1.
6 (2) For purposes of IC 12-12-8, the meaning set forth in
7 IC 12-12-8-2.5.
8 (3) For purposes of IC 12-13-4, the meaning set forth in
9 IC 12-13-4-1.
10 (4) For purposes of IC 12-12.7-2, the meaning set forth in
11 IC 12-12.7-2-2.
12 (5) For purposes of IC 12-21-4, the meaning set forth in
13 IC 12-21-4-1.
14 (6) For purposes of IC 12-8-3.5, the meaning set forth in
15 IC 12-8-3.5-1.
16 SECTION 2. IC 12-8-3.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
17 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
2024	IN 1416—LS 6996/DI 147 2
1 JULY 1, 2024]:
2 Chapter 3.5. Indiana Eating Disorder Council
3 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "council" refers to the Indiana
4 eating disorder council established by this chapter.
5 Sec. 2. The Indiana eating disorder council is established within
6 the office of the secretary.
7 Sec. 3. (a) The council consists of the following members:
8 (1) The secretary or the secretary's designee.
9 (2) The administrator of the office of Medicaid policy and
10 planning or the administrator's designee.
11 (3) The director of the division of mental health and addiction
12 or the director's designee.
13 (4) The commissioner of the Indiana department of health or
14 the commissioner's designee.
15 (5) The commissioner of the department of insurance or the
16 commissioner's designee.
17 (6) The secretary of education or the secretary's designee.
18 (7) The commissioner of the commission for higher education
19 or the commissioner's designee.
20 (8) One (1) member appointed by the governor from a list of
21 three (3) individuals provided by the Indiana Hospital
22 Association.
23 (9) One (1) psychologist appointed by the governor from a list
24 of three (3) individuals provided by the Indiana Psychological
25 Association.
26 (10) One (1) pediatrician appointed by the governor from a
27 list of three (3) individuals provided by the Indiana Chapter
28 of the American Academy of Pediatrics.
29 (11) One (1) psychiatrist appointed by the governor from a list
30 of three (3) individuals provided by the Indiana Psychiatric
31 Society.
32 (12) One (1) licensed social worker appointed by the governor
33 from a list of three (3) individuals provided by the Indiana
34 Chapter of the National Association of Social Workers.
35 (13) One (1) psychiatric nurse practitioner appointed by the
36 governor from a list of three (3) individuals provided by the
37 Coalition of Advanced Practice Registered Nurses of Indiana.
38 (14) One (1) registered dietician appointed by the governor
39 from a list of three (3) individuals provided by the Indiana
40 Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics.
41 (15) One (1) member who conducts research on eating
42 disorders appointed by the governor from a list of three (3)
2024	IN 1416—LS 6996/DI 147 3
1 individuals provided by the Indiana Psychological
2 Association.
3 (16) One (1) member who conducts research on public health
4 policy appointed by the governor from a list of three (3)
5 individuals provided by the Indiana Public Health
6 Association.
7 (17) Three (3) members each of whom:
8 (A) have an eating disorder; or
9 (B) have experience working with individuals who have
10 eating disorders;
11 appointed by the governor from a list of five (5) individuals
12 provided by the Riley Hospital for Children Charis Center for
13 Eating Disorders.
14 (b) Each member appointed in subsection (a)(9) through (a)(14)
15 must work with individuals who have eating disorders.
16 Sec. 4. (a) Not later than October 1, 2024, the applicable
17 appointing authorities shall appoint members to the council.
18 (b) The initial appointments shall begin not later than January
19 1, 2025, and the initial terms of the members initially appointed
20 expire June 30, 2027.
21 (c) After the initial appointments, each member shall serve a
22 two (2) year term ending June 30 of the appropriate odd-numbered
23 year.
24 (d) Members of the council may be reappointed to successive
25 terms.
26 Sec. 5. The members of the council shall annually elect one (1)
27 chair and one (1) vice chair.
28 Sec. 6. (a) If a vacancy occurs on the council, the appointing
29 authority that appointed the member whose position is vacant shall
30 appoint an individual to fill the vacancy.
31 (b) An individual appointed to fill a vacancy must have the
32 qualifications that a member appointed by the appointing
33 authority must have.
34 (c) An individual appointed to fill a vacancy serves for the
35 remainder of the term of the member the individual is appointed
36 to succeed.
37 Sec. 7. The council shall meet:
38 (1) at least quarterly; and
39 (2) upon the call of the chair.
40 Sec. 8. Ten (10) members of the council constitute a quorum.
41 The affirmative votes of a majority of the members appointed to
42 the council are required for the council to take action on any
2024	IN 1416—LS 6996/DI 147 4
1 measure.
2 Sec. 9. The office of the secretary shall staff the council.
3 Sec. 10. A member of the council is not entitled to a per diem.
4 However, a member of the council is entitled to receive the
5 reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
6 IC 4-13-1-4 and other expenses actually incurred in connection
7 with the member's duties as provided in the state polices and
8 procedures established by the Indiana department of
9 administration and approved by the budget agency.
10 Sec. 11. The council shall do the following:
11 (1) Oversee the development and implementation of eating
12 disorder awareness, education, and prevention programs.
13 (2) Identify strategies to improve access to adequate diagnosis
14 and treatment services for individuals with eating disorders.
15 (3) Assist the office of the secretary in identifying research
16 projects concerning eating disorders.
17 (4) Work with the office of the secretary and other
18 appropriate entities to routinely examine existing:
19 (A) surveillance systems;
20 (B) data collection systems; and
21 (C) administrative data bases;
22 to determine the best strategies for implementing evidence
23 based eating disorder measures that provide data for
24 program and policy planning.
25 (5) Collaborate and coordinate on data research projects with
26 the office of the secretary and other appropriate entities.
27 (6) Apply for grants from the federal government, private
28 foundations, or other sources that may be available for
29 programs related to eating disorders.
30 (7) Make legislative or regulatory recommendations
31 concerning eating disorders as appropriate.
32 (8) Not later than December 1 each year, prepare and submit
33 a report summarizing the council's activities, findings, and
34 recommendations to the:
35 (A) legislative council in an electronic format under
36 IC 5-14-6; and
37 (B) governor.
38 Sec. 12. This chapter expires July 1, 2034.
2024	IN 1416—LS 6996/DI 147