House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 166
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 285: yeas 89, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Alting added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Bohacek
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Representatives Garcia Wilburn V and King J added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Goss-Reaves) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Authored by Representative Goss-Reaves
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McNamara
|
|
|