Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 92
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 291: yeas 45, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 98, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives McGuire, Patterson, Shackleford
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative DeVon
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 48, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senators Rogers, Leising, Pol added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Yoder added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Deery added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Alting added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senators Donato, Bohacek, Brown L added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Walker K added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Authored by Senator Charbonneau
|
|
|