Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 99
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 299: yeas 46, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 307: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M and Carrasco
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Pol
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Jeter, Zimmerman and Garcia Wilburn
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Torr and Bauer M
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representatives Jeter and Steuerwald added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Torr
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Carrasco added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Brown L
|
|
|