Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 73
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 89, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representative Zimmerman added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Moseley added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Lehman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Zay added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Holdman
|
|
|