Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 74
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Cosponsor: Representative Wesco
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Smaltz
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Amendment #5 (Donato) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Gaskill added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Donato
|
|
|