Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 101
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 266: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Dernulc added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Olthoff and Aylesworth
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Slager
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Niemeyer
|
|
|