House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Rogers added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Cosponsors: Representatives Goss-Reaves and Garcia Wilburn | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Ledbetter | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 43, nays 6 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Committee report: without recommendation, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senator Charbonneau added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senator Crider |