Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senator Johnson, T added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senator Dernulc added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senator Crane added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senator Young M added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senator Goode G added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senators Maxwell and Alexander added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senator Zay added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senators Buchanan, Donato, Byrne, Raatz, Rogers, Doriot, Messmer added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senator Gaskill added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senator Garten added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senator Brown L |