House | 02/19/2024 | Representative King added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Representative Cherry added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Karickhoff | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Baird | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 47, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Baldwin added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senator Holdman |