Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0064 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 64
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 5-20-1-4.3; IC 32-31.
77 Synopsis: Housing matters. Requires, before November 1, 2024, the
88 Indiana housing and community development authority (authority) to
99 prescribe a statement of the rights of a residential tenant in Indiana.
1010 Specifies the contents of the statement. Requires the authority to: (1)
1111 make the statement available to residential landlords throughout
1212 Indiana; and (2) post the statement on the authority's website. Requires,
1313 after October 31, 2024, a residential landlord to provide a tenant with
1414 the statement at the time the tenant enters into or renews a rental
1515 agreement. Provides that a landlord may not increase the rent payable
1616 by a tenant who is at least 62 years of age in an amount that exceeds
1717 10% of the rent payable under the rental agreement in effect on June
1818 30, 2024, and for each year thereafter. Specifies that if a tenancy is
1919 month to month, a landlord may not increase the rent payable by a
2020 tenant who is at least 62 years of age for a succeeding month in an
2121 amount that exceeds: (1) 10%; divided by (2) 12 months; of the amount
2222 of rent payable under the rental agreement applicable to the month to
2323 month tenancy on June 30, 2024, and for each month thereafter.
2424 Indicates that the application of the provisions added by the bill
2525 concerning rental increases is not affected by a change in the
2626 ownership of the property if the new owner continues to use the
2727 property to rent dwelling units.
2828 Effective: July 1, 2024.
2929 Ford J.D.
3030 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
3131 2024 IN 64—LS 6338/DI 129 Introduced
3232 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
3333 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
3434 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
3535 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
3636 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
3737 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
3838 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
3939 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
4040 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
4141 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
4242 SENATE BILL No. 64
4343 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
4444 property.
4545 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
4646 1 SECTION 1. IC 5-20-1-4.3 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
4747 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
4848 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 4.3. (a) This section applies to a residential
4949 4 landlord-tenant relationship subject to the residential
5050 5 landlord-tenant statute (as defined in IC 32-31-2.9-2).
5151 6 (b) The definitions in IC 32-31-3 apply throughout this section.
5252 7 (c) Before November 1, 2024, the authority shall prescribe a
5353 8 statement of the rights of a residential tenant in Indiana that shall
5454 9 be known as "the tenant's bill of rights".
5555 10 (d) The statement required by subsection (c) must contain the
5656 11 following:
5757 12 (1) A statement describing a tenant's entitlement to a security
5858 13 deposit under IC 32-31-3.
5959 14 (2) A statement concerning the moving and storage of a
6060 15 tenant's property under IC 32-31-4.
6161 16 (3) A statement concerning modifications to a rental
6262 17 agreement and rights of access to a dwelling unit under
6363 2024 IN 64—LS 6338/DI 129 2
6464 1 IC 32-31-5.
6565 2 (4) A statement concerning emergency possessory orders as
6666 3 described in IC 32-31-6.
6767 4 (5) A statement concerning a tenant's obligations under a
6868 5 rental agreement as provided under IC 32-31-7.
6969 6 (6) A statement describing a landlord's obligations under a
7070 7 rental agreement as provided under IC 32-31-8.
7171 8 (7) A statement specifying that a landlord is prohibited from
7272 9 engaging in retaliatory acts under IC 32-31-8.5.
7373 10 (8) A statement concerning the rights of tenants who are
7474 11 victims of certain crimes under IC 32-31-9.
7575 12 (9) A statement concerning:
7676 13 (A) residential eviction actions as described in IC 32-31-10;
7777 14 and
7878 15 (B) disclosure of residential eviction information under
7979 16 IC 32-31-11.
8080 17 (10) Information about federal, state, or local rental
8181 18 assistance programs that provide financial assistance or
8282 19 subsidized housing to tenants, including programs available
8383 20 to senior citizens.
8484 21 (11) Other information pertinent to a tenant's rights under a
8585 22 statute listed in IC 32-31-2.9-2 or another law that confers
8686 23 rights to a tenant.
8787 24 (e) Before November 1, 2024, the authority shall:
8888 25 (1) make the statement available to residential landlords
8989 26 throughout Indiana; and
9090 27 (2) post the statement on the authority's website.
9191 28 SECTION 2. IC 32-31-1-19.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
9292 29 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
9393 30 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 19.5. (a) This section applies to a
9494 31 rental agreement entered into or renewed after June 30, 2024.
9595 32 (b) Except as provided in subsection (c), the definitions in
9696 33 IC 32-31-3 apply throughout this section.
9797 34 (c) As used in this section, "tenant" has the meaning set forth in
9898 35 IC 32-31-3-10, but includes only an individual who is at least sixty-
9999 36 two (62) years of age.
100100 37 (d) In the case of a year to year tenancy, a landlord may not
101101 38 increase the rent payable by the tenant in an amount that exceeds
102102 39 ten percent (10%) of the rent payable under the rental agreement
103103 40 in effect on June 30, 2024, and for each year thereafter.
104104 41 (e) In the case of a month to month tenancy, a landlord may not
105105 42 increase the rent payable by the tenant for a succeeding month in
106106 2024 IN 64—LS 6338/DI 129 3
107107 1 an amount that exceeds:
108108 2 (1) ten percent (10%); divided by
109109 3 (2) twelve (12) months;
110110 4 of the amount of rent payable under the rental agreement
111111 5 applicable to the month to month tenancy on June 30, 2024, and for
112112 6 each month thereafter.
113113 7 (f) The application of subsections (d) and (e) is not affected by
114114 8 a change in the ownership of the property if the new owner
115115 9 continues to use the property to rent dwelling units.
116116 10 SECTION 3. IC 32-31-8-5 IS AMENDED TO READ AS
117117 11 FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 5. A landlord shall do
118118 12 the following:
119119 13 (1) Deliver the rental premises to a tenant in compliance with the
120120 14 rental agreement, and in a safe, clean, and habitable condition.
121121 15 (2) Comply with all health and housing codes applicable to the
122122 16 rental premises.
123123 17 (3) Make all reasonable efforts to keep common areas of a rental
124124 18 premises in a clean and proper condition.
125125 19 (4) Provide and maintain the following items in a rental premises
126126 20 in good and safe working condition, if provided on the premises
127127 21 at the time the rental agreement is entered into:
128128 22 (A) Electrical systems.
129129 23 (B) Plumbing systems sufficient to accommodate a reasonable
130130 24 supply of hot and cold running water at all times.
131131 25 (C) Sanitary systems.
132132 26 (D) Heating, ventilating, and air conditioning systems. A
133133 27 heating system must be sufficient to adequately supply heat at
134134 28 all times.
135135 29 (E) Elevators, if provided.
136136 30 (F) Appliances supplied as an inducement to the rental
137137 31 agreement.
138138 32 (5) Comply with IC 32-31-1-19.5.
139139 33 (6) After October 31, 2024, provide a tenant with the
140140 34 statement prescribed by IC 5-20-1-4.3 at the time the tenant:
141141 35 (A) enters into; or
142142 36 (B) renews;
143143 37 a rental agreement.
144144 2024 IN 64—LS 6338/DI 129