Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senators Glick and Gaskill added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Koch added as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Bray removed as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bray
|
|
|