Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0070 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/26/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6066	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 26, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 70	BILL AMENDED: Feb 1, 2024
SUBJECT: Bail and Release Review Commission
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Koch	BILL STATUS: Enrolled
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Steuerwald
FUNDS AFFECTED: XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation:  This bill establishes the Bail and Release Review Commission to review data
concerning bail, bail reform, pretrial release, and related matters. It provides that the Commission expires
June 30, 2026.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: This bill establishes a 16-member temporary executive branch
Commission consisting of four legislators, five members of the executive branch, two members of the
judicial branch, two members representing prosecuting attorneys, one member representing public defenders,
the president of the Indiana Sheriffs Association, and the Association of Indiana Counties. The bill specifies
that lay and legislative members of the Commission are entitled to receive the same per diem, mileage, and
travel allowances paid to legislative members of interim study committees. Members who are state
employees are entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses and other expenses actually incurred.
[Legislative members are reimbursed from funds appropriated to Legislative Council. All other expenses are
paid from funds appropriated to the Governor.]
The Office of the Governor will staff this Commission. 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures:
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
SB 70	1 State Agencies Affected: Office of the Governor; Indiana State Police; Department of Correction; Division
of Mental Health and Addiction; Indiana Supreme Court; Office of Judicial Administration; Prosecuting
Attorneys Council; Indiana Public Defender Council; Indiana Public Defender Commission 
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Mark Goodpaster 317.232.9852
SB 70	2