Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 104
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 333: yeas 43, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 358: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Pol and Alexander
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Meltzer and DeLaney
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Engleman and Boy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representatives Pierce K, Boy, DeLaney added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Engleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senators Freeman and Taylor G
|
|
|