Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0080 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/11/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6105	NOTE PREPARED: Mar 11, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 80	BILL AMENDED: Mar 8, 2024
SUBJECT: Code Publication Amendments.  
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Freeman	BILL STATUS: Enrolled
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Engleman
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: No Fiscal Impact
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill makes Indiana Code publication amendments. It repeals and relocates
a specific Indiana Code definitions chapter for organization of the defined terms by alphabetical order and
to provide for future expansion of the chapter. It makes conforming cross-reference updates. The bill also
resolves technical conflicts between various enrolled acts passed during the 2024 legislative session.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024; January 1, 2025.
Explanation of State Expenditures: 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: 
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jessica Harmon,  317-232-9854.
SB 80	1