Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0108 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 108
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 9-21-3-7.
77 Synopsis: Traffic control ordinances. Provides that a statutory
88 provision prohibiting a turn at a steady red signal applies retroactively
99 to January 1, 2023. Provides that an ordinance prohibiting such a turn
1010 is void and requires the removal of any signs installed under the
1111 authority of a voided ordinance.
1212 Effective: January 1, 2023 (retroactive).
1313 Freeman
1414 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
1515 Transportation.
1616 2024 IN 108—LS 6483/DI 129 Introduced
1717 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1818 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
1919 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2020 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2121 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2222 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2323 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2424 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2525 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2626 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2727 SENATE BILL No. 108
2828 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
2929 motor vehicles.
3030 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3131 1 SECTION 1. IC 9-21-3-7, AS AMENDED BY P.L.211-2023,
3232 2 SECTION 26, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3333 3 JANUARY 1, 2023 (RETROACTIVE)]: Sec. 7. (a) Whenever traffic
3434 4 is controlled by traffic control signals exhibiting different colored lights
3535 5 or colored lighted arrows successively, one (1) at a time or in
3636 6 combination, only the colors green, red, or yellow may be used, except
3737 7 for special pedestrian signals under IC 9-21-18.
3838 8 (b) The lights indicate and apply to drivers of vehicles and
3939 9 pedestrians as follows:
4040 10 (1) Green indication means the following:
4141 11 (A) Vehicular traffic facing a circular green signal may
4242 12 proceed straight through or turn right or left, unless a sign at
4343 13 the place prohibits either turn.
4444 14 (B) Vehicular traffic, including vehicles turning right or left,
4545 15 shall yield the right-of-way to other vehicles and to pedestrians
4646 16 lawfully within the intersection or an adjacent sidewalk at the
4747 17 time the signal is exhibited.
4848 2024 IN 108—LS 6483/DI 129 2
4949 1 (C) Vehicular traffic facing a green arrow signal, shown alone
5050 2 or in combination with another indication, may cautiously
5151 3 enter the intersection only to make the movement indicated by
5252 4 the green arrow or other movement permitted by other
5353 5 indications shown at the same time.
5454 6 (D) Vehicular traffic shall yield the right-of-way to pedestrians
5555 7 lawfully within an adjacent crosswalk and to other traffic
5656 8 lawfully using the intersection.
5757 9 (E) Unless otherwise directed by a pedestrian control signal,
5858 10 pedestrians facing a green signal, except when the sole green
5959 11 signal is a turn arrow, may proceed across the roadway within
6060 12 a marked or unmarked crosswalk.
6161 13 (2) Steady yellow indication means the following:
6262 14 (A) Vehicular traffic facing a steady circular yellow or yellow
6363 15 arrow signal is warned that the related green movement is
6464 16 being terminated and that a red indication will be exhibited
6565 17 immediately thereafter.
6666 18 (B) A pedestrian facing a steady circular yellow or yellow
6767 19 arrow signal, unless otherwise directed by a pedestrian control
6868 20 signal, is advised that there is insufficient time to cross the
6969 21 roadway before a red indication is shown, and a pedestrian
7070 22 may not start to cross the roadway at that time.
7171 23 (3) Steady red indication means the following:
7272 24 (A) Except as provided in clauses (B) and (D), vehicular
7373 25 traffic facing a steady circular red or red arrow signal shall
7474 26 stop at a clearly marked stop line. However, if there is no
7575 27 clearly marked stop line, vehicular traffic shall stop before
7676 28 entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection. If
7777 29 there is no crosswalk, vehicular traffic shall stop before
7878 30 entering the intersection and shall remain standing until an
7979 31 indication to proceed is shown.
8080 32 (B) Except when a sign is in place prohibiting a turn described
8181 33 in this clause, vehicular traffic facing a steady red signal, after
8282 34 coming to a complete stop, may cautiously enter the
8383 35 intersection to do the following:
8484 36 (i) Make a right turn.
8585 37 (ii) Make a left turn if turning from the left lane or a
8686 38 designated left-turn lane of a one-way street into another
8787 39 one-way street with the flow of traffic.
8888 40 Vehicular traffic making a turn described in this clause shall
8989 41 yield the right-of-way to pedestrians lawfully within an
9090 42 adjacent crosswalk and to other traffic using the intersection.
9191 2024 IN 108—LS 6483/DI 129 3
9292 1 (C) Unless otherwise directed by a pedestrian control signal
9393 2 pedestrians facing a steady circular red or red arrow signal
9494 3 may not enter the roadway.
9595 4 (D) This clause does not apply to the operation of an autocycle
9696 5 or a bicycle directed by a bicycle traffic control signal under
9797 6 section 8.5 of this chapter. If the operator of a motorcycle,
9898 7 motor driven cycle, or bicycle approaches an intersection that
9999 8 is controlled by a traffic control signal, the operator may
100100 9 proceed through the intersection on a steady red signal only if
101101 10 the operator:
102102 11 (i) comes to a complete stop at the intersection for at least
103103 12 one hundred twenty (120) seconds; and
104104 13 (ii) exercises due caution as provided by law, otherwise
105105 14 treats the traffic control signal as a stop sign, and determines
106106 15 that it is safe to proceed.
107107 16 (4) No indication or conflicting indications means the following:
108108 17 (A) Except as provided in clause (C), vehicular traffic facing
109109 18 an intersection having a signal that displays no indication or
110110 19 conflicting indications, where no other control is present, shall
111111 20 stop before entering the intersection.
112112 21 (B) After stopping, vehicular traffic may proceed with caution
113113 22 through the intersection and shall yield the right-of-way to
114114 23 traffic within the intersection or approaching so closely as to
115115 24 constitute an immediate hazard.
116116 25 (C) Vehicular traffic entering an intersection or crosswalk
117117 26 facing a pedestrian hybrid beacon may proceed without
118118 27 stopping if no indication is displayed on the pedestrian hybrid
119119 28 beacon.
120120 29 (5) This subdivision applies to traffic control signals located at a
121121 30 place other than an intersection. A stop required under this
122122 31 subdivision must be made at the signal, except when the signal is
123123 32 supplemented by a sign or pavement marking indicating where
124124 33 the stop must be made.
125125 34 (c) This subsection applies to an ordinance adopted after
126126 35 December 31, 2022. A consolidated city may not adopt an ordinance
127127 36 requiring the installation of a sign prohibiting a turn described in
128128 37 subsection (b)(3)(B).
129129 38 (d) An ordinance adopted after December 31, 2022, and before
130130 39 July 1, 2023, is void. The consolidated city shall remove any signs
131131 40 installed under the authority of a voided ordinance.
132132 41 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
133133 2024 IN 108—LS 6483/DI 129