House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Vinzant added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senators Taylor G and Glick added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senators Bohacek and Pol added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Cosponsor: Representative Morris
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Engleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Byrne) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Alexander added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senators Dernulc and Tomes added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Niemeyer added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Byrne
|
|
|