Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 75
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 232: yeas 31, nays 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 81, nays 10
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives VanNatter, Manning, King
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Culp
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 35, nays 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Hunley) failed; Roll Call 93: yeas 11, nays 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Hunley) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #6 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senators Donato, Koch, Byrne, Vinzant added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Alting added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Buchanan added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|