Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 107
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 293: yeas 44, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 92, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Representative Criswell added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives McNamara and Meltzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative King
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Alexander added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Donato added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|