House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senators Deery, Freeman, Dernulc, Messmer, Niemeyer, Zay added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senators Byrne, Buchanan, Carrasco, Garten added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Busch added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Rowray, Zimmerman, Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Prescott
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senators Walker G, Walker K, Gaskill, Maxwell, Bassler added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senators Johnson T, Brown L, Koch, Raatz added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Holdman added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senators Crane and Goode added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senators Alting, Doriot, Charbonneau added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Crider added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Donato added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Alexander
|
|
|