Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 109
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 294: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 261: yeas 97, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment #4 (Judy) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives DeVon, Lauer, Heine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Judy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Johnson T) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Johnson T added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Walker G
|
|
|