Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Summers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rule 105.1 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Johnson T added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Donato added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Ledbetter, Patterson, Olthoff
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Lauer
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Walker G
|
|
|