Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 113
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 242: yeas 33, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 66, nays 31
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #4 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 201: yeas 36, nays 58
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 200: yeas 29, nays 63
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 199: yeas 31, nays 62
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 84; Failed, Roll Call 185: yeas 28, nays 59
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted Roll Call 184: yeas 59, nays 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Minority report (DeLaney) not substituted for majority report Roll Call 183: yeas 28, nays 58
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Davis, Teshka, Heaton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Behning
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 39, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 98: yeas 8, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 97: yeas 9, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #5 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 96: yeas 7, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #6 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 95: yeas 8, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #7 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 94: yeas 8, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #11 (Goode) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #15 (Deery) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 34, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #14 (Deery) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senators Donato, Crane, Rogers added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Byrne added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senators Deery, Raatz and Johnson T
|
|
|