Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 26
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 91, nays 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representative Klinker added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Cosponsor: Representative Teshka J
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Manning
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 39, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senators Alting and Walker K
|
|
|