Senate | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 27 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 91, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Morrison | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 48, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senator Dernulc added as second author | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |