Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 115
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 295: yeas 45, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Behning
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senator Raatz
|
|
|