Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0212 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/30/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6927	NOTE PREPARED: Jan 30, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 212	BILL AMENDED: Jan 29, 2024 
SUBJECT: Various Education Matters.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Raatz	BILL STATUS: As Passed Senate
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Behning
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
XDEDICATED
XFEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: Indiana School for the Blind and Visually Impaired: This bill provides that the
Indiana School for the Blind and Visually Impaired Board shall give preference to a candidate for the chief
executive officer position who meets the qualifications for an Indiana teacher's certificate in the area of visual
impairment disabilities, but shall not require a candidate for the chief executive officer position to meet the
qualifications for an Indiana teacher's certificate in the area of visual impairment disabilities.
Indiana School for the Deaf: This bill also provides that, subject to approval by the Indiana School for the
Deaf Board, the Indiana School for the Deaf may partner with an existing nonprofit corporation to benefit
the purposes of the school.
Superintendent Contracts: The bill provides that the public meeting that must be held before a contract for
employment is entered into by a governing body and a school superintendent may take place at a regular or
special meeting of the governing body and does not have to happen at least seven days before the contract
is entered into. The bill also provides that if only one new member is elected to the board of the governing
body, a governing body may enter into a contract with a superintendent after the election.
Three-Cueing: This bill prohibits a teacher preparation program from using curriculum or content that is
based on the three-cueing model.
COVID-19 Relief Programs: The bill amends the Student Learning Recovering Grant Program and Fund.
It also amends the Indiana Student Enrichment Grant Program.
Primetime Program: It repeals the Primetime Program. It also repeals provisions regarding the Primetime
SB 212	1 Program.
Micro-credential: The bill requires the Department of Education to establish criteria for determining whether
a credential qualifies as a micro-credential.
Effective Date: Upon passage; July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Indiana School for the Deaf (ISD): ISD may experience a workload
[and/or expenditure] increase to partner with a nonprofit corporation.
COVID-19 Relief Programs: Under this bill, two programs aimed at reducing COVID-19 related learning
loss will no longer expire in FY 2026. This represents a workload increase for the Department of Education
(DOE) who will be required to continue administering the programs, including preparing an annual report
for the 1008 Grant Program. These provisions are not expected to increase total expenditures unless more
funds are appropriated into the program.
Micro-credentials: Micro-credentials are defined under this bill and DOE is required to establish the criteria
for determining whether a credential received by a K-12 student qualifies as a micro-credential. DOE, in
partnership with All4Ed and BloomBoard, established a pilot program in FY 2023 in which four participating
public high schools will award micro-credentials to their students. Public schools and community programs
have also used JobReady Indy’s badge system to award students with proof that they have received training
in certain soft skills. To the extent that DOE can draw from these or similar programs, any increase to the
agency’s workload due to this provision may be reduced.
State Educational Institutions (SEIs): SEIs whose teacher preparation programs instruct teacher candidates
in the three-cueing model will experience a minor workload increase to change their curriculum.
Additionally, SEIs that received  1008 Grants to provide educational services will have additional time to
expend funds that have already been obligated. [SEIs receive state funding through General Fund
appropriations.]
Additional Information -
COVID-19 Relief Programs: The 1008 Grant Program and Indiana Learns are no longer set to expire under
this bill. $150 M was initially appropriated in FY 2021 and an additional $16 M of state ESSER funds were
appropriated to the 1008 Grant Program. The program provided grants to eligible educational entities that
provided in-person learning recovery services to students. As of the end of FY 2023, approximately $47 M
has been obligated but not yet distributed to eligible entities.
Indiana Learns is a statewide grant program that awards $1,000 to qualifying families to provide approved
high-dosage mathematics and english/language arts tutoring to certain elementary students. Funds are
deposited into an account that families use to make payments towards qualified expenses. The bill repeals
statutes that:
(1) Allowed only federal funds to award grants through the program;
(2) Prohibited additional grants to be awarded through the program after ESSER funds appropriated
to Indiana Learns is exhausted; and
(3) Expired all Indiana Learns accounts on October 1, 2024.
As of January 2024 the Indiana Learns program still has nearly $100,000 in unobligated funds, and
SB 212	2 approximately $7 M that has already been deposited into Indiana Learns Accounts has not yet been spent. 
Explanation of State Revenues: SEIs: If additional funds are appropriated to the 1008 Grant Program, SEIs
may have additional funding opportunities to receive grants from the program.
Explanation of Local Expenditures: COVID-19 Relief Programs: Public schools who receive 1008 Grants
to provide educational services will have additional time to expend funds that have already been obligated.
Public schools are also no longer required to provide matching federal funds as a requirement to receive 1008
Grants.
Explanation of Local Revenues: COVID-19 Relief Programs: Indiana Learns participants will have extra
time to expend funds that they have already received. To the extent that this allows more students to
participate in a tutoring program through an approved public school, school revenue may increase. Public
schools may also have additional funding opportunities if additional funds are appropriated to the 1008 Grant
Program or Indiana Learns.
State Agencies Affected: Department of Education; Indiana School for the Visually Impaired; Indiana
School for the Deaf; state educational institutions.
Local Agencies Affected: Public schools.
Information Sources: JobReady Indy, https://www.jobreadyindy.org/badges.html;
Department of Education Micro-credential Pilot,
https://www.in.gov/doe/about/news/indiana-department-of-education-announces-employability-skills-gra
nt-recipients,-additional-resources/;
Department of Education, 2023 Student Learning Recovery Grant Report.
https://s3.us-east-2.amazonaws.com/iga-publications/agency_report/2023-11-02T15-39-58.912Z-2023%2
0-%20Student%20Learning%20Recovery%20Grant%20Report.pdf;
Indiana Learns, https://www.indianalearns.org/.
Fiscal Analyst: Kelan Fong,  317-232-9592.
SB 212	3