Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0212 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/27/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6927	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 27, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 212	BILL AMENDED: Feb 26, 2024 
SUBJECT: Various Education Matters.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Raatz	BILL STATUS: As Passed House
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Behning
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
DEDICATED
XFEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: Indiana School for the Blind and Visually Impaired: This bill provides that the
Indiana School for the Blind and Visually Impaired Board shall give preference to a candidate for the chief
executive officer position who meets the qualifications for an Indiana teacher's certificate in the area of visual
impairment disabilities, but shall not require a candidate for the chief executive officer position to meet the
qualifications for an Indiana teacher's certificate in the area of visual impairment disabilities.
Indiana School for the Deaf: This bill also provides that, subject to approval by the Indiana School for the
Deaf Board, the Indiana School for the Deaf may partner with an existing nonprofit corporation to benefit
the purposes of the school.
Superintendent Contracts: The bill provides that the public meeting that must be held before a contract for
employment is entered into by a governing body and a school superintendent may take place at a regular or
special meeting of the governing body and does not have to happen at least seven days before the contract
is entered into. The bill also provides that if only one new member is elected to the board of the governing
body, a governing body may enter into a contract with a superintendent after the election.
Three-Cueing: This bill prohibits a teacher preparation program from using curriculum or content that is
based on the three-cueing model.
Indiana Learns: The bill amends the Indiana Student Enrichment Grant Program.
Primetime Program: It repeals the Primetime Program. It also repeals provisions regarding the Primetime
Program.
SB 212	1 Effective Date: Upon passage; July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Indiana School for the Deaf (ISD): ISD may experience a workload
[and/or expenditure] increase to partner with a nonprofit corporation.
Indiana Learns: Under this bill, the Indiana Learns program will no longer expire in FY 2026. This
represents a workload increase for the Department of Education (DOE) who will be required to continue
administering the program. Total expenditures are not expected to increase unless more funds are
appropriated into the program.
State Educational Institutions (SEIs): SEIs whose teacher preparation programs instruct teacher candidates
in the three-cueing model will experience a minor workload increase to change their curriculum. [SEIs
receive state funding through General Fund appropriations.]
Additional Information -
Indiana Learns: Indiana Learns is a statewide grant program that awards $1,000 to qualifying families to
provide approved high-dosage mathematics and english/language arts tutoring to certain elementary students.
Funds are deposited into an account that families use to make payments towards qualified expenses. The bill
repeals statutes that:
(1) Allowed only federal funds to award grants through the program;
(2) Prohibited additional grants to be awarded through the program after ESSER funds appropriated
to Indiana Learns is exhausted; and
(3) Expired all Indiana Learns accounts on October 1, 2024.
As of January 2024 the Indiana Learns program still has nearly $100,000 in unobligated funds, and
approximately $7 M that has already been deposited into Indiana Learns Accounts has not yet been spent. 
Explanation of State Revenues:
Explanation of Local Expenditures:
Explanation of Local Revenues: Indiana Learns: Indiana Learns participants will have extra time to expend
funds that they have already received. To the extent that this allows more students to participate in a tutoring
program through an approved public school, school revenue may increase. Public schools may also have
additional funding opportunities if additional funds are appropriated to the Indiana Learns program.
State Agencies Affected: Department of Education; Indiana School for the Visually Impaired; Indiana
School for the Deaf; State educational institutions.
Local Agencies Affected: Public schools.
Information Sources: Indiana Learns, https://www.indianalearns.org/.
Fiscal Analyst: Kelan Fong,  317-232-9592.
SB 212	2