Senate | 03/13/2024 | Public Law 118 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 266: yeas 98, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senator Baldwin added as second author | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Cherry | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Thompson | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 47, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Authored by Senator Holdman |