Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 121
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 310: yeas 41, nays 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 325: yeas 75, nays 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M and Maxwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Hunley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Concurrence withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, King, Cherry and Andrade
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Zimmerman and Harris
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 67, nays 23
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representatives Karickhoff, King, Miller D added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Garten added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 38, nays 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Maxwell) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Senator Maxwell
|
|
|