Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 35
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 243: yeas 44, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Andrade, Moseley, Boy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Pressel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senators Vinzant, Tomes, Doriot, Randolph added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senators Leising, Qaddoura, Alexander added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Dernulc added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Glick added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pol
|
|
|