House | 02/06/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senator Becker added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senators Walker G, Crane, Doriot, Zay added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senator Rogers added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senator Messmer added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Lehman | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Lindauer | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Authored by Senator Bassler |