| 1 | + | *ES0281.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 20, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | SENATE BILL No. 281 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF SB 281 (Updated February 20, 2024 8:50 am - DI 140) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 9-18.1; IC 14-16. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Child safety requirements for off-road vehicles. Provides |
---|
| 9 | + | that an individual less than 18 years of age is not required to wear a |
---|
| 10 | + | helmet while operating or riding on an off-road vehicle if certain |
---|
| 11 | + | requirements are met. Provides that a person may not knowingly |
---|
| 12 | + | authorize or permit an individual less than 18 years of age to operate |
---|
| 13 | + | or ride on an off-road vehicle in violation of the statute providing |
---|
| 14 | + | helmet requirements for off-road vehicle operators. |
---|
| 15 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 16 | + | Messmer, Crider |
---|
| 17 | + | (HOUSE SPONSORS — LINDAUER, BARTELS, MCNAMARA) |
---|
| 18 | + | January 16, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and |
---|
| 19 | + | Transportation. |
---|
| 20 | + | January 30, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 21 | + | February 1, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 22 | + | February 5, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 43, nays 5. |
---|
| 23 | + | HOUSE ACTION |
---|
| 24 | + | February 12, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation. |
---|
| 25 | + | February 20, 2024, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 26 | + | ES 281—LS 6127/DI 151 February 20, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 9-18.1-14-11, AS ADDED BY P.L.141-2017, |
---|
15 | | - | SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
16 | | - | JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 11. (a) As used in this section, "child restraint |
---|
17 | | - | system" has the meaning set forth in IC 9-13-2-23. |
---|
18 | | - | (b) Except as provided in subsection (c), an individual less than |
---|
19 | | - | eighteen (18) years of age who is operating or riding on an off-road |
---|
20 | | - | vehicle shall wear a helmet that meets the standards established by the |
---|
21 | | - | United States Department of Transportation under 49 CFR 571.218 as |
---|
22 | | - | in effect January 1, 1979. |
---|
23 | | - | (c) An individual less than eighteen (18) years of age who is |
---|
24 | | - | operating or riding on an off-road vehicle is not required to wear |
---|
25 | | - | a helmet if: |
---|
26 | | - | (1) the individual is properly fastened and restrained by a |
---|
27 | | - | child restraint system according to the child restraint system |
---|
28 | | - | manufacturer's instructions; |
---|
29 | | - | (2) the child restraint system is designed to protect the |
---|
30 | | - | individual's head; and |
---|
| 42 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 9-18.1-14-11, AS ADDED BY P.L.141-2017, |
---|
| 43 | + | 2 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
| 44 | + | 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 11. (a) As used in this section, "child restraint |
---|
| 45 | + | 4 system" has the meaning set forth in IC 9-13-2-23. |
---|
| 46 | + | 5 (b) Except as provided in subsection (c), an individual less than |
---|
| 47 | + | 6 eighteen (18) years of age who is operating or riding on an off-road |
---|
| 48 | + | 7 vehicle shall wear a helmet that meets the standards established by the |
---|
| 49 | + | 8 United States Department of Transportation under 49 CFR 571.218 as |
---|
| 50 | + | 9 in effect January 1, 1979. |
---|
| 51 | + | 10 (c) An individual less than eighteen (18) years of age who is |
---|
| 52 | + | 11 operating or riding on an off-road vehicle is not required to wear |
---|
| 53 | + | 12 a helmet if: |
---|
| 54 | + | 13 (1) the individual is properly fastened and restrained by a |
---|
| 55 | + | 14 child restraint system according to the child restraint system |
---|
| 56 | + | 15 manufacturer's instructions; |
---|
| 57 | + | 16 (2) the child restraint system is designed to protect the |
---|
| 58 | + | 17 individual's head; and |
---|
| 59 | + | ES 281—LS 6127/DI 151 2 |
---|
| 60 | + | 1 (3) the off-road vehicle: |
---|
| 61 | + | 2 (A) is factory equipped to secure the child in a child |
---|
| 62 | + | 3 restraint system; and |
---|
| 63 | + | 4 (B) has a roll over protection structure. |
---|
| 64 | + | 5 (b) (d) An individual who violates this section commits a Class C |
---|
| 65 | + | 6 infraction. |
---|
| 66 | + | 7 SECTION 2. IC 14-16-1-33, AS ADDED BY P.L.141-2017, |
---|
| 67 | + | 8 SECTION 3, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
| 68 | + | 9 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 33. A person who is: |
---|
| 69 | + | 10 (1) the owner of an off-road vehicle; |
---|
| 70 | + | 11 (2) in possession of an off-road vehicle; or |
---|
| 71 | + | 12 (3) entitled to the possession of an off-road vehicle, whether by |
---|
| 72 | + | 13 reason of legal title, lease, license, rental arrangement, lease with |
---|
| 73 | + | 14 option to purchase, contract of conditional sale, or otherwise; |
---|
| 74 | + | 15 may not knowingly authorize or permit an individual less than eighteen |
---|
| 75 | + | 16 (18) years of age to operate the or ride on the off-road vehicle in |
---|
| 76 | + | 17 violation of IC 9-18.1-14-11. |
---|
| 77 | + | ES 281—LS 6127/DI 151 3 |
---|
| 78 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 79 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security |
---|
| 80 | + | and Transportation, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 281, has had |
---|
| 81 | + | the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back |
---|
| 82 | + | to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as |
---|
| 83 | + | follows: |
---|
| 84 | + | Page 1, line 10, after "age" insert "who is operating or riding on |
---|
| 85 | + | an off-road vehicle". |
---|
| 86 | + | Page 1, line 14, delete "and". |
---|
| 87 | + | Page 1, line 16, delete "head." and insert "head; and |
---|
34 | | - | (B) has a roll over protection structure. |
---|
35 | | - | (b) (d) An individual who violates this section commits a Class C |
---|
36 | | - | SEA 281 2 |
---|
37 | | - | infraction. |
---|
38 | | - | SECTION 2. IC 14-16-1-33, AS ADDED BY P.L.141-2017, |
---|
39 | | - | SECTION 3, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
40 | | - | JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 33. A person who is: |
---|
41 | | - | (1) the owner of an off-road vehicle; |
---|
42 | | - | (2) in possession of an off-road vehicle; or |
---|
43 | | - | (3) entitled to the possession of an off-road vehicle, whether by |
---|
44 | | - | reason of legal title, lease, license, rental arrangement, lease with |
---|
45 | | - | option to purchase, contract of conditional sale, or otherwise; |
---|
46 | | - | may not knowingly authorize or permit an individual less than eighteen |
---|
47 | | - | (18) years of age to operate the or ride on the off-road vehicle in |
---|
48 | | - | violation of IC 9-18.1-14-11. |
---|
49 | | - | SEA 281 President of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
51 | | - | Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
52 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
53 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
54 | | - | SEA 281 |
---|
| 91 | + | (B) has a roll over protection structure.". |
---|
| 92 | + | Page 2, line 11, delete "an" and insert "the". |
---|
| 93 | + | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 94 | + | (Reference is to SB 281 as introduced.) |
---|
| 95 | + | CRIDER, Chairperson |
---|
| 96 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0. |
---|
| 97 | + | _____ |
---|
| 98 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 99 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to |
---|
| 100 | + | which was referred Senate Bill 281, has had the same under |
---|
| 101 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with |
---|
| 102 | + | the recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 103 | + | (Reference is to SB 281 as printed January 31, 2024.) |
---|
| 104 | + | PRESSEL |
---|
| 105 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 |
---|
| 106 | + | ES 281—LS 6127/DI 151 |
---|