Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 332: yeas 45, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Representative Davis added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Representative Pierce M removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Taylor G added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Pol removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Taylor G removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Taylor G, Maxwell and Bohacek
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Pol
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Bartels, Miller D, Gore and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Jeter and Pierce M
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Concurrence withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Miller D added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Jeter
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Freeman added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Authored by Senators Maxwell and Bohacek
|
|
|