House | 02/16/2024 | Returned to the Senate | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 150: yeas 83, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Rogers added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Cosponsors: Representatives Jordan, King, Speedy | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Miller D | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Authored by Senators Doriot, Bohacek, Donato | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Mishler |