House
|
04/16/2025
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
House concurred with Senate amendments; Roll Call 365: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Cosponsor: Senator Ford J.D.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Walker K, Donato, Hunley
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Representative Meltzer added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Amendment #1 (Meltzer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Authored by Representative Campbell
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Coauthored by Representatives Dant Chesser and Judy
|
|
|