Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 554: yeas 85, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 522: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M and Koch
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate conferees appointed: Carrasco and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House advisor appointed: Meltzer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House conferees appointed: Engleman and Pierce M
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Carrasco
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Authored by Representative Engleman
|
|
|