Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0129 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*SB0129.1*
2-January 22, 2025
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 129
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF SB 129 (Updated January 16, 2025 11:21 am - DI 87)
6-Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1; noncode.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1-50.2.
77 Synopsis: Landlocked property. Defines "landlocked property" as real
88 property that has been shut off from all public highways as a result of
99 the vacation of one or more public highways. Provides that if an action
1010 of the state, or an agency or political subdivision of the state, causes
1111 real property to become landlocked property, the county assessor of the
1212 county in which the landlocked property is located must assess the
13-value of the landlocked property at the same rate that native forest land,
14-a forest plantation, or wildlands are assessed for as long as the property
15-qualifies as landlocked property.
13+value of the landlocked property at zero for as long as the property
14+qualifies as landlocked property if the property owner files an affidavit
15+stating that the property does not have access to any public highway.
1616 Effective: January 1, 2025 (retroactive).
17-Buck, Niemeyer
17+Buck
1818 January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
19-January 21, 2025, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass; reassigned to Committee on
20-Tax and Fiscal Policy.
21-SB 129—LS 6549/DI 129 January 22, 2025
19+2025 IN 129—LS 6549/DI 129 Introduced
2220 First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
2321 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2422 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2523 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2624 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2725 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2826 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2927 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3028 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3129 between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3230 SENATE BILL No. 129
3331 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3432 taxation.
3533 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3634 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-50.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3735 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3836 3 JANUARY 1, 2025 (RETROACTIVE)]:
3937 4 Chapter 50.2. Vacation of a Public Highway Resulting in
4038 5 Landlocked Property
4139 6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "landlocked property" means
4240 7 real property that has been shut off from all public highways as a
4341 8 result of the vacation of one (1) or more public highways.
4442 9 Sec. 2. If an action of the state, or an agency or political
4543 10 subdivision of the state, causes real property to become landlocked
4644 11 property, the county assessor of the county in which the landlocked
4745 12 property is located must assess the value of the landlocked
48-13 property at the same rate that native forest land, a forest
49-14 plantation, or wildlands are assessed under IC 6-1.1-6-14 for as
50-15 long as the property qualifies as landlocked property, if the owner
51-16 of the property complies with section 3 of this chapter.
52-17 Sec. 3. The county assessor may reduce the assessment of a
53-SB 129—LS 6549/DI 129 2
54-1 property under this chapter only if the owner of the property files
55-2 an affidavit with the county assessor stating that the property does
56-3 not have access to any public highway as a result of the state or an
57-4 agency or political subdivision of the state vacating one (1) or more
58-5 public highways. The affidavit must be signed under oath by the
59-6 owner of the property.
60-7 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2025 (RETROACTIVE)]
61-8 (a) IC 6-1.1-50.2, as added by this act, applies to assessment dates
62-9 occurring after December 31, 2024.
63-10 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2028.
64-11 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
65-SB 129—LS 6549/DI 129 3
66-COMMITTEE REPORT
67-Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to
68-which was referred Senate Bill No. 129, has had the same under
69-consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
70-the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
71-Page 1, delete lines 12 through 15 and insert "property is located
72-must assess the value of the landlocked property at the same rate
73-that native forest land, a forest plantation, or wildlands are
74-assessed under IC 6-1.1-6-14 for as long as the property qualifies
75-as landlocked property, if the owner of the property complies with
76-section 3 of this chapter.".
77-and when so amended that said bill do pass and be reassigned to the
78-Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy.
79-(Reference is to SB 129 as introduced.)
80-BUCK, Chairperson
81-Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0.
82-SB 129—LS 6549/DI 129
46+13 property at an amount equal to zero (0) for as long as the property
47+14 qualifies as landlocked property, if the owner of the property
48+15 complies with section 3 of this chapter.
49+16 Sec. 3. The county assessor may reduce the assessment of a
50+17 property under this chapter only if the owner of the property files
51+2025 IN 129—LS 6549/DI 129 2
52+1 an affidavit with the county assessor stating that the property does
53+2 not have access to any public highway as a result of the state or an
54+3 agency or political subdivision of the state vacating one (1) or more
55+4 public highways. The affidavit must be signed under oath by the
56+5 owner of the property.
57+6 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2025 (RETROACTIVE)]
58+7 (a) IC 6-1.1-50.2, as added by this act, applies to assessment dates
59+8 occurring after December 31, 2024.
60+9 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2028.
61+10 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
62+2025 IN 129—LS 6549/DI 129