Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0132 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 12/30/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6511	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 10, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 132	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Childhood Obesity Study Topics.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Ford J.D.	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
XDEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: The bill establishes the Childhood Obesity Commission as a temporary
commission to study childhood obesity. It requires the commission to submit an annual report to the
Governor and the General Assembly not later than June 30, 2026.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2025.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Childhood Obesity Commission- The bill establishes a new temporary
commission to be staffed by the Indiana Department of Health (IDOH). The commission is comprised of 10
members, including four members of the General Assembly, two non-state employee members, and four state
employees. Total expenses for the commission will depend on the number of meetings held. Expenses for
legislative members of the commission are to be paid by either the Legislative Council or the Legislative
Services Agency. Expenses for other commission members are to be paid from budgeted appropriations to
the IDOH. [The IDOH's administrative expenditures are currently paid from the Tobacco Master Settlement
Fund, a dedicated fund.]
The bill would also impact workload at the IDOH to provide staff to the commission and complete the annual
report. It is anticipated this can be accomplished with existing resources.
Additional Information: A legislative member of the commission is entitled to a $213 per diem, $85.20
subsistence (as of October 1, 2024), and mileage of $0.67 per mile (as of January 1, 2024) for each meeting
attended. A lay member of the task force who is not a state employee is entitled to a $75 per diem and
mileage of $0.67 per mile (as of January 1, 2024) for each meeting attended. A member of the commission
who is a state employee is entitled to reimbursement of actual travel expenses incurred.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
SB 132	1 State Agencies Affected: Indiana Department of Health; Family Social Services Administration; Department
of Education; Office of the Governor; Legislative Council.
Local Agencies Affected:
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Allison Leeuw,  317-234-9465.
SB 132	2